WY SF0050 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to emergency expenses of government related to business relief; providing funding for grants to agriculture businesses impacted by COVID-19; providing an appropriation of federal CARES Act or other similarly purposed funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 business relief programs agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-0-0-0-3 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-0-1-1-3 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05 Assigned Chapter Number 110
2021-04-05 Became Law without Signature
2021-04-01HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0035
2021-04-01SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0035
2021-04-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0035
2021-03-30SenateConcur:Passed 27-0-0-0-3
2021-03-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2021-03-29House3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0
2021-03-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-25HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-24HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-24HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-1-0-0
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2021-02-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-02-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-0-1-1-3
2021-01-29Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-01-28SenateCOW:Passed
2021-01-28SenatePlaced on General File
2021-01-28SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-01-27Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2021-01-12SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/SF0050.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/SF0050.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Enroll/SF0050.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0050SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0050SS002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0050SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0050S2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0050S3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0050HS001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/SF0050.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Summaries/SF0050.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050#-68
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050#-92
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050#131
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050#-642
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050#5284
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0050#412

Bill Comments

feedback