WY SF0045 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation of mineral production; codifying the payment of ad valorem taxation during the transition period between the current payment schedule and monthly payment of the tax; specifying penalties; repealing related provisions; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Monthly ad valorem tax revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-1-1-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2021-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-1-1-0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |