WY SF0042 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 136 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 136 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; creating the Emergency Administration of Opiate Antagonist Act; providing for prescription and administration of an opiate antagonist drug as specified; granting immunity from criminal or civil liability for specified conduct; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Opiate overdose emergency treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-0-5-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-0-5-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-0-5-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 136 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0050 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0050 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0050 |
2017-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0050 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 25-0-5-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-08 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |