WY SF0041 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned Chapter Number 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wildlife; increasing the request for funding for animal damage management from the game and fish commission; requiring the game and fish commission to recommend expenditures; clarifying who can request funding; establishing a fee for animal damage management funding; repealing provisions related to the wildlife damage management stamp; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Animal damage management funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number 48 | |
2020-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0011 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0011 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0011 |
2020-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0011 | |
2020-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-27 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-26 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |