WY SF0035 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways; granting powers to the transportation commission; defining duties of the transportation commission and the department of transportation; granting tolling authority for interstate 80; creating a program for the planning and implementation of tolling on interstate 80; providing for the review of tolling plans; creating accounts; specifying the allowable deposits and withdrawals from the accounts; granting bonding authority; requiring accounting and reporting; authorizing loans from the state highway fund; providing rulemaking authority; authorizing alternative design and construction methods; allowing assistance between state agencies; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tolling authority for I-80.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-11 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |