WY SF0032 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; revising provisions relating to political party affiliation changes by electors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Change in political party affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-22 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-24 | Bill Number Assigned |