WY SF0018 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 44 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 44 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to special districts; removing boards of cooperative educational services from the Special District Public Records and Meetings Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Special district public records-BOCES.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 44 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0014 | |
2017-02-16 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0014 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0014 |
2017-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0014 | |
2017-02-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-24 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-05 | Bill Number Assigned |