WY HB1001 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-03 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-13-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-03 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-13-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to labor and employment; prohibiting employers in Wyoming from requiring COVID-19 vaccinations with emergency use authorizations or a COVID-19 vaccination as a condition of employment except as specified; providing for exemptions; providing for reasonable alternative measures for employees unable or unwilling to receive a COVID-19 vaccine; authorizing rulemaking; providing conditional sunset dates; providing applicability; providing an appropriation; authorizing a position; and providing for an effective date.
Title
COVID-19 vaccine employer mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-13-3-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment failed 9-19-2-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 18-9-2-0-1 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 17-10-2-0-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment adopted 16-10-4-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment failed 9-17-4-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment adopted 15-11-4-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Amendment failed 18-40-2-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-10-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment failed 9-19-2-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 18-9-2-0-1 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 17-10-2-0-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment adopted 16-10-4-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment failed 9-17-4-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Amendment adopted 15-11-4-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Amendment failed 18-40-2-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-10-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 14-13-3-0-0 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 15-13-2-0-0 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-11-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-11-01 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-10-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 38-20-2-0-0 |
2021-10-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-10-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-10-27 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-10-27 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2021-10-26 | House | Pursuant to HR 16 Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-10-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-10-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-10-21 | Bill Number Assigned |