WY HB0269 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to decedent's estates; repealing the rule of descent for an illegitimate person; making a conforming amendment; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Illegitimate persons descent-repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 125
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0058
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0058
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0058
2019-02-20 Assigned Number HEA No. 0058
2019-02-20Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2019-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-15SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback