WY HB0205 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing additional application and license fees as specified; providing for distribution of fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game and fish-animal damage management fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Robert McKim [R] |
Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Sen. Wyatt Agar [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Fred Emerich [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |