WY HB0202 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 152 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicle insurance; increasing penalties for failing to sufficiently insure a motor vehicle; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle insurance-penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08 Chapter No. 152 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0099
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0099
2017-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0099
2017-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0099
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-23SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2017-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0
2017-02-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-02HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-01HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2017-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback