WY HB0198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Administrative Procedure Act; specifying the applicability of the act to local and state agencies; creating definitions; clarifying provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Administrative Procedure Act clarification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 0-7-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 0-7-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |