WY HB0183 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to concealed weapons; repealing gun free zones; providing for the carrying of concealed weapons as specified; clarifying that only the state legislature may regulate firearms, weapons and ammunition as specified; defining a term; amending a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal gun free zones and preemption amendments-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - :Recall from Committee failed Pursuant to HR 5-6 24-32-4-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-04 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-31 | :Recall from Committee failed Pursuant to HR 5-6 24-32-4-0-0 | |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |