WY HB0180 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to vital records; specifying a maximum fee for certified copies or searches of vital records; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vital records fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Wilson [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Andy Schwartz [D] |
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4- (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4- | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |