WY HB0170 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; providing that the department of transportation shall provide for alternative documentation to receive a state agricultural fuel tax refund as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State agricultural fuel tax refund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2014-02-21 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2014-02-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0170.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0170.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0170.htm |