WY HB0151 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental immunity; providing a waiver of governmental immunity for damages caused by a violation of whistleblower statutes for medical facilities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Governmental immunity-waiver for hospital employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Sue Wilson [R] |
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Sen. John Hastert [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2015-03-02 | Senate | COW |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-25 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0151.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0151.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0151.pdf |