WY HB0134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to seized property; specifying that proceeds from the sale of forfeited property shall be deposited in the crime victims compensation account; repealing conflicting provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Seized property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - COW:Passed 30-29-1-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - COW:Passed 30-29-1-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0 |
2015-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | COW:Passed 30-29-1-0-0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-26 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0134.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0134.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0134.pdf |