WY HB0126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; creating the revenue recalibration task force as specified; establishing membership; providing duties and responsibilities; authorizing consulting services; requiring a report; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue recalibration task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseDid Not Consider in CoW
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-17HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback