WY HB0119 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; authorizing prescribers to prescribe medications for off label indication as specified; authorizing pharmacists to dispense medications for off label indication as specified; providing prescribers and pharmacists immunity from disciplinary action as specified; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical prescriptions-off label purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Abby Angelos [R] | Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Jeremy Haroldson [R] |
Rep. Ben Hornok [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Pepper Ottman [R] |
Rep. Sarah Penn [R] | Rep. Scott Smith [R] | Rep. Jeanette Ward [R] | Sen. Evie Brennan [R] |
Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 |
2023-02-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-30 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2023-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |