WY HB0103 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil and criminal procedure; providing a privilege for journalists who refuse to disclose news information as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Journalists-privileged communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-19 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-24-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-02 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |