WY HB0091 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to real property and conveyances; establishing procedures for removing unenforceable restrictive covenants for real property; specifying what restrictive covenants are unenforceable; providing immunity from civil liability as specified; authorizing a civil action for new instruments recorded to remove an enforceable restrictive covenant; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Removal of unenforceable property covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 70 | |
2021-04-02 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0032 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0032 |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0032 |
2021-03-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0032 | |
2021-03-26 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-01 | Bill Number Assigned |