WY HB0076 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 182 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public education; providing that the heritage, history and contributions of American Indian tribes be addressed through education; imposing requirements on the state board of education and the department of education; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Indian education program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0076JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0076JC001: 51-0-9-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0076JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0076JC001: 51-0-9-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 8-48-4-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 8-48-4-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 182 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0119
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0119
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0119
2017-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0119
2017-03-03SenateAdopted HB0076JC001: 26-0-4-0-0
2017-03-03HouseAdopted HB0076JC001: 51-0-9-0-0
2017-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-03-02HouseConcur:Failed 8-48-4-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-13SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2017-01-31SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-30House3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0
2017-01-27House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-26HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-24HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2017-01-19HouseRerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2017-01-19HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2017-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback