WY HB0075 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; adopting the Compact for a Balanced Budget as provided; providing for the proposal and ratification of a Balanced Budget Amendment to the Constitution of the United States as specified; providing for powers, duties and procedures relative to the Compact; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Balanced Budget Compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Nathan Winters [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-23 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-23 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 |
2015-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-23 | Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0075.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0075.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0075.pdf |