WY HB0071 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to capital leasing by school districts; clarifying leasing authority by school districts; modifying school facility commission approval for the lease of equipment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Leasing of equipment.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Rep. Gregg Blikre [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA0016 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0016 |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0016 |
2014-02-28 | Assigned Number HEA0016 | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-17 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |