WY HB0063 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; authorizing the department of environmental quality to submit an amended greenhouse gas regulation state implementation plan to the United States environmental protection agency; authorizing the department of environmental quality to promulgate new source performance standards for greenhouse gases; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State primacy on greenhouse gas regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA0023 | |
2013-02-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0023 |
2013-02-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0023 |
2013-02-11 | Assigned Number HEA0023 | |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-23 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-26 | Bill Number Assigned |