WY HB0052 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workplace safety; providing for a discount in worker's compensation premiums for employers who participate in the health and safety consultation program of the Wyoming department of workforce services as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Workplace safety initiatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Sen. John Hines [R] | Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - S Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - S Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - H Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - H Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - S Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - H Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - H Adopted HB0052JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0076 |
2013-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0076 |
2013-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA0076 | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Adopted HB0052JC01 |
2013-02-20 | House | Adopted HB0052JC01 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-13 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-13 | House | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-11 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-15 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-15 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-14 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-14 | Bill Number Assigned |