WY HB0046 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - COW:Failed 23-34-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to civil actions; specifying that agricultural feed products are not subject to a strict liability standard of fault in civil actions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural feed products-civil liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - COW:Failed 23-34-3-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseCOW:Failed 23-34-3-0-0
2019-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-22HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback