WY HB0041 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 26 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 26 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professional licensing; granting the board of barber examiners authority to establish requirements as specified; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Barbering license requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 26 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0015 |
2015-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0015 |
2015-02-17 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0015 | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2015-01-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-22 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |