WY HB0039 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to virtual education; creating an exception to virtual education requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Remote education within a school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 7 | |
2020-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0005 | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0005 |
2020-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0005 |
2020-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0005 | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-26 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-11 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |