WY HB0039 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 80 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 80 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; repealing Wyoming's aggregate campaign contribution limit; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Aggregate campaign contribution limits-repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 80 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0048 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0048 |
2015-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0048 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-19 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2015-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-15 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |