WY HB0037 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; authorizing the development of an expedited process for the exchange of state lands for the purpose of public access to state lands; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary land exchange process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2020-02-19HouseH05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 52-7-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback