OH SB92 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred to committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred to committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3501.022 of the Revised Code to allow a special election to be held in August for certain purposes, to require a special election to be held on August 8, 2023, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Allow special election to be held in August for certain purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: General Government |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to committee: General Government |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Elections
Finance and Appropriations
House Government Oversight Committee
Senate General Government Committee
Finance and Appropriations
House Government Oversight Committee
Senate General Government Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 01 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |