WY HB0033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned Chapter Number 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned Chapter Number 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; providing legislative findings; creating criminal offenses related to interference with public contracts; defining terms; specifying penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Interference with public contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Assigned Chapter Number 36 | |
2021-03-30 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0022 | |
2021-03-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2021-03-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2021-03-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0022 | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-22 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-04 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |