WY HB0028 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education accountability; specifying implementation and development of education accountability addressing teacher and school leader evaluation; providing for phase I school accountability implementation and refinement; prescribing oversight and use of district assessment systems in state accountability; modifying state criteria for high school graduation; providing for continuation of select accountability and advisory committees; imposing reporting requirements; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State education accountability and assessment.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2014-02-21 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0028.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0028.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0028.htm |