WY HB0020 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to fire prevention and electrical safety; authorizing collection of fees for plan inspection or review for school buildings; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire prevention and electrical safety-fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA0013
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0013
2014-02-28HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0013
2014-02-28 Assigned Number HEA0013
2014-02-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-26SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-26SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2014-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20HousePassed CoW
2014-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-17HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-12-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback