WY HB0020 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Medicaid; authorizing payment to relatives of persons with developmental disabilities or acquired brain injuries as specified; amending a definition; creating a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid-reimbursement of services.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-03-01 - Senate - S Adopted HB0020JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - H Adopted HB0020JC01 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 Assigned Chapter Number
2011-03-03 Governor Signed HEA No. 0091
2011-03-02 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0091
2011-03-01 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0091
2011-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0091
2011-03-01 (S) Adopted HB0020JC01
2011-02-28 (H) Adopted HB0020JC01
2011-02-23 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-02-23 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2011-02-22 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-18 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-17 (S) Passed CoW
2011-02-14 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-14 (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-27 (S) Introduced and Referred to S10
2011-01-25 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-01-20 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-19 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-18 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-17 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-17 (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-12 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2011-01-11 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-11-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback