WV SCR44 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name portion of I-79 in Monongalia County "Charles J. Whiston Interchange"
Title
Requesting DOH name portion of I-79 in Monongalia County "Charles J. Whiston Interchange"
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House Message received | |
2012-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-03-07 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Be adopted | |
2012-02-28 | To House Rules | |
2012-02-28 | To Rules | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-27 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-27 | Reported be adopted | |
2012-02-21 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-21 | On Unfinished Business | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Filed for introduction |