WV SCR35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-02 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating days for displaying Honor and Remember Flag at WV Veterans Memorial

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating days for displaying Honor and Remember Flag at WV Veterans Memorial

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-02SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-01HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-01HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2019-03-01HouseReported by the Clerk
2019-03-01HouseOn Unfinished Business, Special Calendar
2019-02-28HouseBe adopted
2019-02-21HouseTo House Rules
2019-02-21HouseTo Rules
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-21SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-21SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2019-02-21SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-20SenateReported be adopted
2019-02-18SenateTo Military
2019-02-18SenateTo Military
2019-02-18SenateOn Unfinished Business
2019-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-15SenateFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback