WV SCR35 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-02 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-02 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating days for displaying Honor and Remember Flag at WV Veterans Memorial
Title
Designating days for displaying Honor and Remember Flag at WV Veterans Memorial
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-01 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-01 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-21 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | To Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |