WV SCR19 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge in Wetzel County "Lt. Howard R. 'Bob' Crothers Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge in Wetzel County "Lt. Howard R. 'Bob' Crothers Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House Message received | |
2012-02-22 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-02-22 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-22 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-02-22 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-02-21 | Be adopted | |
2012-02-15 | To House Rules | |
2012-02-15 | To Rules | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-14 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-14 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-14 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-14 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-01-31 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-01-31 | On Unfinished Business | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Filed for introduction |