WV SB97 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions & Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions & Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing senior judge to continue receiving per diem compensation beyond annual salary of sitting judge due to delay by Governor in filling vacancy
Title
Allowing senior judge to continue receiving per diem compensation beyond annual salary of sitting judge due to delay by Governor in filling vacancy
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] |
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 104) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2020-02-12 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 104) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/7/20 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |