WV SB81 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to correct certain cross references in the West Virginia Uniform Trust Code to be consistent with other language concerning the standards governing trust directors and directed trustees.
Title
Relating generally to WV Uniform Trust Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 404) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 403) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 403) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | To Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-02 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 404) |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 403) |
2021-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44D | 1 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 10 | 1008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 8A | 809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |