WV SB723 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring Department of Education develop plan based on analyzed data on school discipline
Title
Requiring Department of Education develop plan based on analyzed data on school discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 759) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 758) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 540) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 530) (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 529) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 528) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 758) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 540) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 530) (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 529) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 528) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 759) |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 758) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 540) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 530) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 529) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 528) |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-25 | House | To Education |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 234) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 234) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Education |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |