WV SB710 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring impact statement in certain instances of school closing or consolidation
Title
Requiring impact statement in certain instances of school closing or consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 224) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/6 |
2021-04-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | To House Education |
2021-03-29 | House | To Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 224) |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Originating in Senate Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |