WV SB676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 291, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 291, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting fees from Child Abuse Registry be used for information technology support costs
Title
Permitting fees from Central Abuse Registry be used for information technology support costs
Sponsors
Sen. Kenny Mann [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 168) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 291, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/2/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | To Governor 2/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/20 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 168) |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-11 | House | Reference dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |