WV SB664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 263, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 263, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding physician's assistant to list of medical professionals capable of determining if individual lacks capacity
Title
Adding physician's assistant to list of medical professionals capable of determining if individual lacks capacity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 660) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 263, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/20 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 660) |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-28 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 30 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |