WV SB660 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the aggravated criminal offense of reckless driving resulting in death, establish the related penalty, and make several non-substantive technical corrections.
Title
Establishing aggravated felony offense of reckless driving resulting in death
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 319) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 319) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |