WV SB638 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Terminating severance tax exemption for production of natural gas or oil
Title
Terminating certain severance tax exemption for production of natural gas or oil
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/18/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/15/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | To Governor 4/15/13 |
2013-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 7) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 7) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-05 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 213) |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 212) |
2013-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-05 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2013-04-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2013-04-05 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2013-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | House | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-03 | House | Reference dispensed |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 21) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass with amends and title amend; but first to Finance |
2013-03-25 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2962 (Same As) 2013-04-05 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar