WV HB2962 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemptions from the tax on the privilege of severing natural gas and oil
Title
Relating to exemptions from the tax on the privilege of severing natural gas and oil
Sponsors
Del. Harry White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, House Calendar, until 4/3/13 |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-25 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-19 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Same As) 2013-05-15 - Chapter 188, Acts, Regular Session, 2013