WV SB627 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase civil and criminal penalties for the crime of littering and to direct the Secretary of the Department of Environmental Protection to coordinate a state-wide litter reporting program.
Title
Increasing civil and criminal penalties for littering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 386) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on House Calender | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-03-08 | Do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2010-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-02-19 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-19 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-19 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 15A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 15A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=627&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |